FL H0751 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises state agency reporting requirements; defines "conviction"; authorizes applicable boards or DBPR to make certain findings relating to rehabilitation during licensing decisions; provides factors that must be considered in making such findings.
Title
Use of Criminal History in Licensing
Sponsors
House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] | Rep. Vicki Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Original reference removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-24 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | PCS added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1012 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |