FL H0745 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exception to general law; authorizes business licensed to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises within specified area to sell such beverages for consumption off premises; provides boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alachua County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#103 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Approved by Governor
2019-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-16SenateReceived
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-11SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-12HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback