FL H0739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies deficiencies county or municipality may provide comments on regarding applications for development permits or development orders; requires local governments to adopt residential infill development standards; provides guidelines for local governments in developing residential infill development standards; requires local governments to adopt regulations to be used by applicants seeking designations as residential infill development; prohibits local government from denying applications if applicant has generally complied with regulations; requires local governments to amend their development regulations & comprehensive plans to incorporate residential infill developments as zoning classifications; specifies deficiencies over which local government may provide comments or request information on regarding applications for building permits.
Title
Local Government Land Development Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1248 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 792 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |