FL S1248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the authority of a county or municipality, respectively, to make additional comments on an application for approval of a development permit or development order; requiring local governments to adopt residential infill development standards by a specified date; specifying guidelines local governments must use in developing residential infill development standards; prohibiting a local government from approving applications with many deficiencies; requiring local governments to amend their development regulations and comprehensive plans to incorporate residential infill developments as a zoning classification and incorporate them as an appropriate land use classification, etc.
Title
Local Government Land Development Actions
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H739 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 792 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1248 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1248/BillText/Filed/HTML |