FL H0733 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DHSMV to include an individual's name in specified databases when they receive developmental disability designation on their ID card or driver license; authorizes person with Alzheimer's disease or dementia-related disorder to have designation placed on his or her ID card or driver license & requires DHSMV to include such an individual's name in specified databases.
Title
Identification of Persons with Special Needs
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] | Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Original reference removed: Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H735 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
S1040 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1040 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |