FL H0735 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exemption from public records requirements for all records, data, information, correspondence, & communications relating to enrollment of persons in registry of persons with special needs; provides exceptions; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Registry of Persons with Special Needs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14HouseDied in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-03-12HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2021-11-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H733 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
S1042 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1040 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40288Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback