FL H0733 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applications for comprehensive plan amendments or development orders to include public participation plan; specifies required time for plan implementation; specifies plan purposes & required plan information; specifies requirements for target area for notification; specifies that notice requirements are in addition to other notice requirements of law; provides applicant authority for plan implementation, etc.
Title
Public Participation Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00068 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1942 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs