FL H0731 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises legislative intent concerning obligations of bail bond agent; specifies that failure to appear requires bond & bonds or money deposited as bail to be forfeited; revises circumstances that require forfeiture to be discharged; revises amount of forfeiture to be remitted under different specified conditions; specifies that certain provisions concerning cancellation of bond do not apply if bond is forfeited within specified period after it has been posted; provides that original appearance bond does not guarantee placement in any court-ordered program.
Title
Bail Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2016-02-05 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1464 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
903 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |