FL H0729 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires comprehensive plans & plan amendments that apply to certain lands within or near Everglades Protection Area to follow state coordinated review process; requires DEP to make determinations, consult, & coordinate with specified entities regarding such plans & amendments; provides additional limitation for compliance determination of such plans & plan amendments; prohibits & provides requirements for adoption of certain development amendments within Everglades Protection Area.
Title
Everglades Protection Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S932 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |