FL H0711 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires AHCA to provide coverage for yearly mammograms & yearly supplemental breast cancer screenings for certain women; revises coverages for mammograms under certain individual accident & health insurance policies, group, blanket, & franchise accident & health insurance policies, & HMOs; requires coverages for supplemental breast cancer screenings under such policies & contracts.
Title
Coverage for Mammograms and Supplemental Breast Cancer Screenings
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S670 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 9064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/711 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/711/BillText/Filed/PDF |