FL H0711 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises legislative intent of Florida Endangered & Threatened Species Act; directs FWCC & DACS to protect certain endangered or threatened species; revises criteria for placement of species on Regulated Plant Index by DACS; prohibits FWCC & DACS from considering certain costs when designating species as endangered or threatened.
Title
Endangered and Threatened Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S238 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 1026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 4115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/711 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/711/BillText/Filed/PDF |