FL H0707 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises contents of employer policy statement with respect to employee drug use; revises frequency of followup testing; revises specimen collection, verification, & documentation procedures; revises requirements for confirmation testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug-free Workplaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S890 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback