FL H0701 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits EBT cards from being accepted in certain locations or for certain activities.
Title
Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#193 (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#193 (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-88 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1048 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-18 | House | CS passed; YEAS 89 NAYS 26 |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-04 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-29 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-18 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-13 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2013-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1048 (Same As) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 701 (Ch. 2013-88)