FL H0687 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DVA to establish Florida Veterans' Care Coordination Program to provide behavioral health care referral & care coordination services for veterans & their families; authorizes DVA to contract with certain nonprofit entity to enter into agreements with Florida 211 Network participants to provide such services; provides for statewide delivery of specified services by program teams; requires Florida 211 Network participants to collect program implementation data & submit such data to DVA; requires DVA to submit report to Governor & Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Services for Veterans and Their Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#618 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2020-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-14HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-13HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-03HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-11-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S104 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3949087Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback