FL H0685 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires BOG to establish uniform reporting requirements for state university auxiliary enterprises; & provides state university responsibilities relating to auxiliary enterprises.
Title
State University Auxiliary Enterprises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-21 | House | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S642 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/685 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/685/BillText/Filed/PDF |