FL H0665 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises required health education in public schools to include information regarding dangers & signs of human trafficking.
Title
Human Trafficking Education in Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Spano [R] | Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0286 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/665 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0665/BillText/Filed/PDF |