FL H0659 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception to provision that deems use of single zip code as rating territory for insurance rates to be unfairly discriminatory; provides duties for OIR concerning such rates; authorizes Florida Automobile JUA & joint underwriting plan approved by OIR to cancel personal lines or commercial policies within specified time for nonpayment of premium due to certain reasons; prohibits insured from cancelling policy or binder within specified time except under certain conditions; requires that certain standard form be approved by office & adopted by FSC, rather than approved by office or adopted by commission; revises standards for compliance for specified billings for medical services; specifies additional entities that may receive reimbursement under Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law regardless of whether they meet specified licensure requirement.
Title
Automobile Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#716 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#716 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Chapter No. 2016-133 | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 5 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1036 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 5 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (707789) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 02/17/16, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-25 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-19 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-11-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1036 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 659 (Ch. 2016-133)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 0651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 739 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 744 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |