FL H0653 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Drug Deterrence Program within AWI; provides legislative intent; provides scope of eligibility for benefits; defines terms; provides for screening of individuals to determine which individuals must be tested; provides for notice; provides terms of disqualification for benefits; requires agency to supply information concerning drug treatment programs; provides for authentication & admissibility of drug tests in unemployment compensation hearings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Testing/Unemployment Compensation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 57
2011-02-22 Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 58
2011-02-08 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0302 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
443093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback