FL H0647 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Trust Fund for Victims of Human Trafficking within DLA; provides for funding sources & purposes of trust fund; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund.
Title
Trust Funds/Trust Fund for Victims of Human Trafficking/DLA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-14 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H649 (Related) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S338 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S340 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S338 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S340 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/647 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/647/BillText/Filed/PDF |