FL H0613 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Now in Education Committee
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to SBE & BOG responsibilities, standards for preeminent state research universities program, performance-based metrics for state universities, length of time Phosphate Research & Activities Board member may serve, & specified growth rates at state universities; requires Commissioner of Education to submit recommendations relating to performance fund for Florida College System institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2020-01-14HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-12-16HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-12-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-12-12HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S72 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
S1402 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10017065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004346Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101190Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback