FL S1402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising standards for the preeminent state research universities program; requiring the Board of Governors to establish standards and measures for specific state university competencies; revising the performance-based metrics for state universities to include specific data beginning in a certain fiscal year; requiring innovative pricing techniques and payment options to include an opt-out provision; prohibiting the growth rate of administrators at a state university from exceeding the growth rate of faculty at such university, etc.
Title
Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H613 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 72 passed
S72 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-117
S72 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-117
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 7065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 346 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |