FL H0611 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements relating to issuance of estoppel certificate to specified persons; requires that estoppel certificate contain certain information; provides effective period for certificate based upon date of issuance & form of delivery; provides that association waives specified claim against person or such person's successors or assigns who rely on certificate in good faith; authorizes summary proceeding to be brought to compel association to prepare or deliver estoppel certificate; specifies maximum amounts association may charge for estoppel certificate; provides that authority to charge fee for estoppel certificate must be established by specified written resolution or provided by written management, bookkeeping, or maintenance contract.
Title
Residential Properties
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. John Wood [R] |
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Jake Raburn [R] | Rep. Ross Spano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-14 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 3 |
2015-04-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-30 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | CS/CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-03-09 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | House | Now in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2015-03-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-04 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0736 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 30851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |