FL H0597 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Florida Young Farmers & Ranchers Matching Grant Program within DACS; provides requirements for recipient eligibility & grant awards; specifies that grant funding is contingent upon legislative appropriation; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Young Farmer and Rancher Matching Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-06HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S922 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28806572Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback