FL H0563 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies rights of children & young adults in out-of-home care; provides roles & responsibilities of DCF & community-based care lead agencies; authorizes district school boards to establish certain educational programs; designates children's ombudsman within DCF & provides responsibilities of ombudsman; requires DCF & community-based care lead agencies to use information provided by ombudsman in carrying out responsibilities; requires DCF to establish statewide toll-free telephone number for ombudsman.
Title
Children and Young Adults in Out-of-home Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/563 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/563/BillText/Filed/PDF |