FL H0549 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides presumptions of legal parentage; authorizes petitions to challenge presumptions of legal parentage; provides petition requirements; requires court to appoint guardian ad litem or attorney ad litem under certain conditions; requires court to hold evidentiary hearing for certain purposes; requires court to require genetic testing of child & alleged parent under certain conditions; requires court to determine parental rights based on best interests of child; requires court to approve, grant, or modify parenting plan under certain conditions; requires court to enter final order or judgment for certain purposes; provides that petition does not impugn or affect child's legitimacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Determination of Parentage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1022 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74219Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback