FL S1022 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a child, the child's mother, or the child's alleged parent to file a petition in circuit court to rebut the presumption of legal parentage; requiring the court to appoint a guardian ad litem or an attorney ad litem under certain conditions; specifying that a statistical probability of parentage of 95 percent or more creates a rebuttable presumption that the alleged parent is a biological parent, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Determination of Parentage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-26SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2017-11-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H549 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74219Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback