FL H0545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to procedures for service on various types of business entities, service outside state & in foreign country, & presuit notice before filing medical negligence complaint.
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1062 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1062 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-01-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-18 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-14 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
495 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 09091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 1045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 15101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 2105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 2109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 8915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 8919 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |