FL H0535 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "officer, employee, or agent," as it applies to immunity from personal liability in certain actions, to include any member of a child protection team, in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Protection Teams

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S256 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback