FL H0517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties to include recommendations of specified districts when developing standards for certificates of public convenience & necessity; provides exemption for certain governmental agencies; requires specified county governing bodies to adopt or amend ordinance to provide standards for issuance of certificates by certain date; requires such counties to adopt review process; provides appeal process; provides applicability.
Title
Certificates of Public Convenience and Necessity for Life Support or Air Ambulance Services
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Local Government Affairs Subcommittee | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Paul Renner [R] |
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | CS/CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-19 | House | CS/CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-04 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-12-03 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-12-01 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 12/01/15, 3:30 pm, 306 HOB |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0742 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Rules