FL H0517 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits DOH from issuing license to, or renewing license of, certain persons who travel to Republic of Cuba to obtain medical training or medical degree; provides exemption for persons who receive training or degree before immigration to United States.
Title
Foreign-Trained Medical Professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0456 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/517 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0517/BillText/Filed/PDF |