FL H0515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 596 (Ch. 2023-218)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 596 (Ch. 2023-218)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grants Office of Inspector General of Board of Governors additional authority to take certain actions in carrying out its duties.
Title
Officer of Inspector General of the Board of Governors of the State University System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 596 (Ch. 2023-218) |
2023-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2023-04-11 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-30 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Original reference removed: Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-29 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-29 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-17 | House | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S596 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-218