FL S0596 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Granting the Office of the Inspector General of the Board of Governors additional authority to take certain actions in carrying out its duties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Governors of the State University System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#432 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16 Chapter No. 2023-218
2023-06-12 Approved by Governor
2023-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-03SenateOrdered enrolled
2023-05-03HousePassed; YEAS 112, NAYS 1
2023-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-02HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-05-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2023-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-01House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-05-01HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
2023-05-01HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-27HouseIn Messages
2023-04-27SenatePassed; YEAS 30 NAYS 9
2023-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-22SenateNow in Rules
2023-03-22SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-08SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2023-03-07SenateFavorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Education Postsecondary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2023-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H515 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 596 (Ch. 2023-218)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/BillText/er/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.pre.he.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.he.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Analyses/2023s00596.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Vote/2023-03-07%200400PM~S00596%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Vote/2023-03-22%201100AM~S00596%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Vote/2023-04-19%200830AM~S00596%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Vote/SenateVote_s00596__009.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/596/Vote/HouseVote_s00596__432.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback