FL H0511 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires charter schools that receive capital outlay funding used for certain purposes to ensure that new facilities comply with State Requirements for Educational Facilities of the Florida Building Code.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2017-11-14 | House | Withdrawn from PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1554 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/511 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/511/BillText/Filed/PDF |