FL S1554 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring charter schools that receive capital outlay funding used for certain purposes to ensure that new facilities comply with the State Requirements for Educational Facilities of the Florida Building Code, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H511 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1554 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1554/BillText/Filed/HTML |