FL H0505 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DCF to create work group to provide recommendations relating to revision of Baker Act; requires workgroup to make recommendations on specified topics; provides for membership & meetings; requires review of draft recommendations by specified date; requires workgroup to submit report to specified entities & Legislature by specified date.
Title
Baker Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0514 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/505 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0505/BillText/Filed/PDF |