FL S0514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to create a workgroup to provide recommendations relating to revision of the Baker Act; requiring the workgroup to make recommendations on specified topics; requiring a review of draft recommendations by a specified date; requiring the workgroup to submit a report to specified entities and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Baker Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/05/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0505 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/514 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0514/BillText/Filed/HTML |