FL H0493 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits employer from requesting or requiring access to social media account of employee or prospective employee; prohibits employer from taking retaliatory personnel action against employee or failing or refusing to hire prospective employee as result of employee's refusal to allow access to his or her social media account; provides for civil action; requires that civil action be brought within specified timeframe; provides for fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Media Accounts Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1468 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback