FL H0491 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 600 (Ch. 2023-219)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 600 (Ch. 2023-219)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for commencement of proceedings for general assignments; provides courts with judicial discretion to determine compliance; provides for assignee's ability to rely on, & defense for good faith compliance with, court orders, judgments, decrees, & rules of law; establishes nonliability of assignee when certain requirements are met; limits assets creditor or other party in interest may pursue in action against assignee; excludes creditors from being required to turn over assets of estate upon notice of assignment action or proceeding; requires negative notice in assignment action by assignee upon filing of notice of rejection.
Title
Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 600 (Ch. 2023-219) |
2023-04-20 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 600 |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-21 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-20 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S600 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-219
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
727 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
727 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
727 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
727 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
727 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |