FL H0487 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain licensed medical professionals from specified provisions concerning the carrying of firearms; requiring certain policies and procedures for law enforcement agencies; providing such professionals have no duty to retreat in certain circumstances; providing immunities and privileges for such professionals; providing construction; requiring the appointing law enforcement agency to issue to tactical medical professionals any firearm or ammunition, etc.
Title
Carrying of Firearms by Tactical Medical Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#350 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#158 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#158 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-77 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 7 |
2019-05-01 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (764278) |
2019-04-30 | House | In returning messages |
2019-04-30 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (764278) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 722 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S722 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2019-77)