FL H0481 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (? 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 937 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (? 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 937 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for storage of electronic filings; requires papers & electronic filings to be electronically time stamped; prohibits clerk from charging fee to view or print docket via Internet; authorizes clerk to remove sealed or expunged court records from Official Records; revises language concerning exemption from charges for services provided to specified officials & their staffs; increases threshold amount for automatic repayment of overpayments; provides for access to clerks' files by state agencies & exemption from copying fees & charges; limits application of exemption from payment of fees & charges assessed by clerks of circuit courts to official use; provides that certain remittances need not be deposited in clerk's Public Records Modernization Trust Fund; authorizes use of electronic proof of publication affidavits; requires certain persons to provide specific information to clerk to maintain public records exemption status of certain information; authorizes clerk to issue refund to depositor for redeemed property subject to tax sale.
Title
Clerks of Court
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | House Government Operations Subcommittee | House Judiciary Committee | House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#990 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 937 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 816 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 816 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 951 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 951 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 896 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 797 | |
2012-02-23 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-22 | CS/CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/22/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, 404 HOB --Not considered | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 312 | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 525 | |
2012-01-31 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-30 | CS/CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 320 | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/30/12, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 226 | |
2012-01-12 | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 211 | |
2012-01-12 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-11 | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 167 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 48 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 11:30 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-11-22 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 170 | |
2011-11-21 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-11-16 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 174 | |
2011-11-09 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/16/11, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-11-04 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 48 | |
2011-10-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 0714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 244 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |