FL H0479 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to create a voluntary certification program for recovery residences; requiring the department to approve credentialing entities to develop and administer the certification program; requiring background screening of employees of a recovery residence; providing for denial, suspension, or revocation of certification; directing the department to approve at least one credentialing entity by a specified date to develop and administer the certification program; requiring the department to publish the list on its website, etc.
Title
Substance Abuse Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#676 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (135649) |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-03 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/14, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-31 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 11:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-24 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0582 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |