FL H0477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DCF to approve third-party credentialing entities to certify persons who serve central abuse hotline & provide adult protective services; requires DCF to approve entities that meet certain requirements; requires certain personnel to be certified by specified date; provides review & appeal process for certifications or sanctions that are imposed by third-party credentialing entity.
Title
Certification of Individuals who Provide Child and Adult Protective Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S272 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/477 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/477/BillText/Filed/PDF |