FL H0473 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides county, municipality, other political subdivision of state, covered entity, or third-party agent that complies with certain requirements is not liable in connection with cybersecurity incident; requires covered entities & third-party agents to adopt revised frameworks, standards, laws, or regulations within specified time period; provides private cause of action is not established; provides certain failures are not evidence of negligence & do not constitute negligence per se; specifies defendant in certain actions has certain burden of proof.
Title
Cybersecurity Incident Liability
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Commerce Committee | Rep. Mike Giallombardo [R] | Rep. Kevin Steele [R] |
Rep. Webster Barnaby [R] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#774 (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#774 (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 8 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 658 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 28 |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-06 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-24 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S658 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 473