FL H0469 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that subscribing witnesses are not required to validate certain instruments conveying or pertaining to a lease of real property, etc.
Title
Real Estate Conveyances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#418 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#418 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-102 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1224 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (031327) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20 |
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-12-13 | House | Now in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1224 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 469