FL H0469 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (? 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]


Requires salvors of pleasure vessels to provide specified verbal & written notice; provides exception; provides remedies for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Salvage of Pleasure Vessels


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#814 (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Transportation; Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 105 NAYS 8
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 1
2018-02-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/27/18, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-02-19HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-19HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2018-02-15HouseCS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 2
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-19HouseCS/CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-16HouseCS/CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 3:00 pm, 216 Capitol
2018-01-09HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-12-11HouseNow in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2017-12-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee

Same As/Similar To

S664 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5599601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599608Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments