FL H0469 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires driver to move over when approaching sanitation or utility service vehicle performing service-related task on roadside.
Title
Move Over Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216) |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | CS referred to Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 02/04/14, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0478 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |