FL H0463 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits adoption or enforcement of certain state & regional programs to regulate greenhouse gas emissions without specific legislative authorization.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S380 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/463 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/463/BillText/Filed/PDF |