FL H0463 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that positive test result for anabolic steroids in greyhound results in violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Steroid Use in Racing Greyhounds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-10HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S674 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1774 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback