FL H0463 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that positive test result for anabolic steroids in greyhound results in violation.
Title
Steroid Use in Racing Greyhounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S674 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1774 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee
S1774 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/463 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/463/BillText/Filed/PDF |