FL H0459 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises definition of term "last known address"; revises notice requirements relating to enforcing owner's lien; authorizes notice by first-class mail, along with certificate of mailing; revises provisions relating to when notice given is presumed delivered; specifies nonapplication of certain provisions to right to create contractual liens & limitations on value of property; requires rental agreements & applications for rental agreements to contain provision for disclosure of applicant's membership in uniformed services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-Service Storage Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#396 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-29 In Messages
2011-04-29 Read 2nd time -HJ 918
2011-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11
2011-04-26 Placed on Calendar -HJ 836
2011-04-25 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-21 CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 775
2011-04-19 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-04-18 Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 671
2011-04-15 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-13 CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 659
2011-04-11 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/13/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-03-10 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/14/11, 4:00 pm, 404 HOB --Discussed
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 44
2011-02-07 Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 44
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1772 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
83803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83808Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback